LOL Finance Co v. C & S of Lake View LLC et al
Plaintiff: LOL Finance Co
Defendant: C & S of Lake View LLC, Olene Page Cox and Shirley Cox Scott
Case Number: 4:2021cv02490
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by C & S of Lake View LLC, Olene Page Cox, Shirley Cox Scott. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Kennedy, Joseph)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co. Shirley Cox Scott served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Berly, Joel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co. Olene Page Cox served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Berly, Joel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LOL Finance Co. C & S of Lake View LLC served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Berly, Joel)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C & S of Lake View LLC, Olene Page Cox, Shirley Cox Scott. Service due by 11/4/2021. (hcic, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by LOL Finance Co.(hcic, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C & S of Lake View LLC, Olene Page Cox, Shirley Cox Scott (ffFiling fee $402 receipt number 0420-10002389), filed by LOL Finance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Loan Commitment, #3 Exhibit C - UCC-1 Financing Statement)(hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOL Finance Co v. C & S of Lake View LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOL Finance Co
Represented By: Joel Anderson Berly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & S of Lake View LLC
Represented By: Joseph Jakob Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olene Page Cox
Represented By: Joseph Jakob Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Cox Scott
Represented By: Joseph Jakob Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?