Stuckey v. JPMorgan Chase & Co
Plaintiff: George D Stuckey doing business as TamerX Performance Diesel
Defendant: Google, LLC and JPMorgan Chase & Co
Case Number: 4:2021cv02502
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/1/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 10/15/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/5/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/6/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/5/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/5/2022, Discovery due by 3/7/2022, Motions due by 4/6/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/5/2022, Mediation Due by 3/7/2022. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 9/10/2021. (lgib, ) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/13/2021 to edit caption) (lgib, ).
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by George D Stuckey. (Hopkins, Joseph)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Baker, Charles) Modified on 9/9/2021 to file separately.(prou, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Baker, Charles) Modified on 9/9/2021 to correct event type and to remove attachment which should have been filed separately. (prou, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION by George D Stuckey. (Hopkins, Joseph)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by George D Stuckey.(Hopkins, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended through September 8, 2021. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 8/13/2021.(prou, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Request for Extension of Time to file Answer by Google, LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/24/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Byrd, Audra)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Audra McCall Byrd on behalf of Google, LLC (Byrd, Audra)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Google, LLC. (lgib, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Williamsburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-45-00251 (filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10003630), filed by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuckey v. JPMorgan Chase & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George D Stuckey doing business as TamerX Performance Diesel
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Heiskell
Represented By: Joseph Clay Hopkins
Represented By: William E Hopkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Audra McCall Byrd
Represented By: Kristen N Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co
Represented By: Bryant S Caldwell
Represented By: Charles J Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?