Geiger et al v. Country Club Inc
Plaintiff: Jessie Golden, Brenda Geiger, Denise Milani Trlica, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Irina Voronina, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Jessica Golden, Lucy Pinder, Mercedes Terrell, Tiffany Toth Gray and Ursula Mayes
Defendant: Country Club Inc doing business as Masters Gentlemen's Club
Case Number: 4:2021cv03521
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Geiger, Jessie Golden, Tiffany Toth Gray, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Mercedes Terrell, Denise Milani Trlica, Irina Voronina (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service)(Slavin, Joshua)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(hcic, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/28/2021) (hcic, ).
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Country Club Inc. Service due by 1/26/2022 (hcic, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brenda Geiger, Jessie Golden, Tiffany Toth Gray, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Mercedes Terrell, Denise Milani Trlica, Irina Voronina.(hcic, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Country Club Inc (filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10148285), filed by Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Denise Milani Trlica, Eva Pepaj, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Toth Gray, Ursula Mayes, Brenda Geiger, Mercedes Terrell, Jessie Golden, Lucy Pinder, Dessie Mitcheson. (hcic, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2021: #1 Photos) (hcic, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger et al v. Country Club Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Golden
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani Trlica
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson Longoria
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Golden
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Terrell
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Joshua Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Club Inc doing business as Masters Gentlemen's Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?