Choice Hotels International Inc v. Pfalzgraf Investment Properties 02 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Choice Hotels International Inc
Defendant: Pfalzgraf Investment Properties 02 LLC and Todd Pfalzgraf
Case Number: 4:2021cv03622
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lgib, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/9/2021 to correct double header) (lgib, ).
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Todd Pfalzgraf, Pfalzgraf Investment Properties 02 LLC. Service due by 2/2/2022. (lgib, )
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Choice Hotels International Inc. (lgib, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Todd Pfalzgraf, Pfalzgraf Investment Properties 02 LLC (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10165198), filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - August 26, 2021 Letter) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choice Hotels International Inc v. Pfalzgraf Investment Properties 02 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Hotels International Inc
Represented By: Marshall Patterson Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfalzgraf Investment Properties 02 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Pfalzgraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?