United States of America v. Conway Pediatrics, PA et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Conway Pediatrics, PA and Lynda Courtney
Case Number: 4:2021cv04024
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #5 Notice of Appearance (Stroud, Joanna)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Brooks Stroud on behalf of United States of America (Stroud, Joanna)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Conway Pediatrics, PA, Lynda Courtney. Service due by 3/14/2022. (lgib, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America. (lgib, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conway Pediatrics, PA, Lynda Courtney, filed by United States of America. Service due by 3/14/2022. (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Conway Pediatrics, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Douglas Barnett
Represented By: Joanna Brooks Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Pediatrics, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?