King v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vashon King
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Mountain Run Solutions LLC, Chris Carter and Brian Fuller
Case Number: 4:2021cv04059
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vashon King. Brian Fuller served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022; Mountain Run Solutions LLC served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Mountain Run, #2 Exhibit B - Service Fuller, #3 Exhibit C - Non service Carter)(Geddings, William)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/1/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/15/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 2/15/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/12/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/12/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/13/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/13/2022, Discovery due by 8/11/2022, Motions due by 8/26/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/11/2022, ADR Statement due by 8/26/2022, Mediation Due by 9/26/2022. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to the date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 12/1/2022. Signed by Chief Judge R Bryan Harwell on 1/12/2022. (hcic, ) Modified on 1/12/2022 to edit text (hcic, ).
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Bryant, Lyndey)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Bryant, Lyndey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chris Carter, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Brian Fuller, Mountain Run Solutions LLC. Service due by 3/16/2022. (hcic, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Vashon King. (hcic, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Carter, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Brian Fuller, Mountain Run Solutions LLC (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10240333), filed by Vashon King. (hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vashon King
Represented By: Penny Hays Cauley
Represented By: William Kyle Geddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Run Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?