Brown v. Supreme Court of South Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Alexander Brown
Defendant: Supreme Court of South Carolina, Sumter-Lee Regional Detention Center, Sumter County Court of General Sessions, Sumter County Court of Common Pleas, The State of South Carolina and The Sumter County Solicitor's Office
Case Number: 4:2022cv00164
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT RE-MAILED (per chambers): #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Demetrius Alexander Brown, #378276, Kirkland R&E Center, 4344 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC, 29210 (dsto, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Demetrius Alexander Brown (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
February 17, 2022 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #14 Order - 1983 - No Service w/NEF, #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Demetrius Alexander Brown, #51104, SLRDC, 1250 Winkles Road, Sumter, SC, 29153 (dsto, )
February 17, 2022 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court render all pending motions moot and dismiss the Complaint in this case with prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/17/2022. (dsto, )
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/17/2022. (dsto, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Sumter County Court of Common Pleas, Sumter County Court of General Sessions, Sumter-Lee Regional Detention Center, Supreme Court of South Carolina, filed by Demetrius Alexander Brown. Service due by 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Proper Form Order w/NEF and Prisoner Complaint form, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Demetrius Alexander Brown, #51104, SLRDC, 1250 Winkles Road, Sumter, SC, 29153 (dsto, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #6 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/03/2022.(dsto, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 2/24/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/03/2022. (dsto, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (dsto, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Demetrius Alexander Brown. Response to Motion due by 2/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION For Request For Emergency Injunction and Declaration Relief by Demetrius Alexander Brown. Response to Motion due by 2/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Supreme Court of South Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Alexander Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Court of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter-Lee Regional Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter County Court of General Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumter County Court of Common Pleas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sumter County Solicitor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?