Gaines v. The State of South Carolina et al
Petitioner: Damorius D. Gaines, Damorius Dontavis Gaines and Damorius Dontavious Gaines
Respondent: The State of South Carolina, Alan Wilson and Warden Lee Correctional Institution
Case Number: 4:2022cv00239
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #13 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation w/NEF, #14 Judgment w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Damorius D. Gaines, #346524, LCI, 990 Wisacky Highway, Bishopville, SC, 29010 (dsto, )
March 9, 2022 Filing 14 JUDGMENT by the Clerk. This petition is dismissed without prejudice and the Respondent is not required to file a return. A certificate of appealability will not be issued. (dsto, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #9 , is adopted and incorporated herein by reference. The petition is dismissed without prejudice and the Respondent is not required to file a return. A certificate of appealability will not be issued. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 03/08/2022. (dsto, )
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #6 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer w/NEF, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Damorius D. Gaines, #346524, LCI, 990 Wisacky Highway, Bishopville, SC, 29010 (dsto, )
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 2254 petition be summarily dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/03/2022. (dsto, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #6 Serve No-Answer Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/03/2022.(dsto, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 02/03/2022. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition)(dsto, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (dsto, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Damorius D. Gaines. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. The State of South Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damorius D. Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damorius Dontavis Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damorius Dontavious Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Lee Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?