United States of America v. $175,000 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $175,000 in United States Currency
Claimant: Ely Nestarez, Jaime Valdivia, First American Land Trust Company, LLC, Mr. Luis Alberto Flores Quintana and Mr. johann Puruncajas
Case Number: 4:2022cv01570
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by $175,000 in United States Currency re #16 Answer to Complaint (Tooker, Samuel)
July 6, 2022 Filing 18 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/27/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 8/10/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/30/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/31/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/31/2022, Discovery due by 12/30/2022, Motions due by 1/30/2023, Bench Trial Deadline 5/1/2023, Mediation Due by 12/30/2022. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 7/6/2022. (lgib, )
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First American Land Trust Company, LLC, Luis Alberto Flores Quintana, johann Puruncajas (Tooker, Samuel)
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 Claimants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by First American Land Trust Company, LLC, Luis Alberto Flores Quintana, johann Puruncajas.(Tooker, Samuel)
July 5, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Government by Ely Nestarez, Jaime Valdivia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Claimant's COS as to Answer)(Torricos, Marcelo)
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 CLAIM Asserting Claimant Jaime Valdivia's Interest by $175,000 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service as to Jaime Valdivia)(Bannister, James)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 CLAIM Asserting Claimant Ely Nestarez's Interest by $175,000 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service as to Ely Nestarez)(Bannister, James)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date June 19, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by $175,000 in United States Currency re #8 Claim (Tooker, Samuel)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by $175,000 in United States Currency re #7 Claim (Tooker, Samuel)
June 16, 2022 Filing 8 CLAIM Claim Pursuant to FRCP Supp AMC Rule G(5)(a) and/or 18 USCA 983(a)(2)(A) by $175,000 in United States Currency. (Tooker, Samuel)
June 16, 2022 Filing 7 CLAIM Claim Pursuant to FRCP Supp AMC Rule G(5)(a) and/or 18 USCA 983(a)(2)(A) by $175,000 in United States Currency. (Tooker, Samuel)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $175,000 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for Arrest of Articles in Rem and Return of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED. (lgib, )
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (lgib, )
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $175,000 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $175,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $175,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ely Nestarez
Represented By: James W Bannister
Represented By: Marcelo Torricos, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jaime Valdivia
Represented By: James W Bannister
Represented By: Marcelo Torricos, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: First American Land Trust Company, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Barton Tooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mr. Luis Alberto Flores Quintana
Represented By: Samuel Barton Tooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mr. johann Puruncajas
Represented By: Samuel Barton Tooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?