Beasley v. Edgefield Mailroom Clerks et al
Plaintiff: Charlton Beasley
Defendant: Edgefield Mailroom Clerks, Edgefield Correctional Institution, John Does, Mr. Parker, Ms. Wells, Mr. Davis, Mr. Hawkes, Mr. Vaneman and Warden Janson
Case Number: 4:2024cv02597
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Filing 12 Letter from Charlton Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dsto, )
May 15, 2024 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #8 Order - 1983 - No Service w/NEF, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Charlton Beasley, #27341-076, FCI Edgefield, PO Box 725, Edgefield, SC, 29824 (dsto, )
May 15, 2024 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court dismiss this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/15/2024. (dsto, )
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #8 No Serve Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/15/2024.(dsto, )
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/15/2024. (dsto, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (dsto, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Charlton Beasley. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Inmate Transactions, #3 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mr. Davis, John Does, Edgefield Correctional Institution, Edgefield Mailroom Clerks, Mr. Hawkes, Warden Janson, Mr. Parker, filed by Charlton Beasley. Service due by 7/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Copies of Envelopes, #2 Supporting Document, #3 Envelope)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Edgefield Mailroom Clerks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlton Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgefield Mailroom Clerks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgefield Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Hawkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Vaneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Janson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?