Robinson v. McFadden
Petitioner: Corey Jawan Robinson
Respondent: Joseph McFadden
Case Number: 5:2014cv04718
Filed: December 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Georgetown
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER AND OPINION: The court GRANTS Petitioner's Motion for an Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 105 ) and Motion to Alter and/or Amend this court's August 7, 2017 Order (ECF No. 106 ). The court further ACCEPTS the Magistrate Judge's Second Report (ECF No. 84 ) GRANTING Respondent's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 78 ) as to Ground Ten and further DENYING Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 1 ) as to the sa me. Petitioner's Motion to Stay Pending Certificate of Probable Cause and Appealability (ECF No. 107 ) is MOOT. As to Ground Ten of Petitioner's Petition, the legal standard for the issuance of a certificate of appealability has not been met. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/12/2017.(prou, )
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: The court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and incorporates it herein. (ECF No. 84 .) It is therefore ORDERED that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DENIED and Respondent's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 78 ) is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/7/2017. (prou, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court ACCEPTS IN PART and REJECTS IN PART the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 58 ). Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 47 ) is GRANT ED IN PART with respect to Grounds One through Nine and Eleven through Thirteen and DENIED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE with respect to Ground Ten. Grounds One through Nine and Eleven through Thirteen of Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas C orpus (ECF No. 1 ) are DENIED. This matter is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration of any further motions and briefings in accordance with this order. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 09/30/2016. (dsto, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Corey Jawan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph McFadden
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?