Robinson v. Gilliard
Plaintiff: Corey Jawan Robinson
Defendant: Mr Gilliard
Case Number: 5:2016cv01635
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Dorchester
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/16/2018. (asni, )
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Attorney Ashleigh Rayanna Wilson for Corey Jawan Robinson added. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/30/2017. (asni, )
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AND OPINION: The court ACCEPTS the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 49 ). It is therefore ordered that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 36 ) is DENIED. The court further denies Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the basis of qualified immunity. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/24/2017. (prou, )
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 21 and 22 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/28/2016. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Gilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Jawan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Gilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?