Garrett v. Bromell et al
Plaintiff: John S Garrett
Defendant: Melvin Bromell, Jr, Hertiage Hauling Inc, Alexis Winburn and Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Case Number: 5:2016cv02888
Filed: August 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Orangeburg
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 JUDGMENT in favor of Hertiage Hauling Inc, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Alexis Winburn, Melvin Bromell, Jr against John S Garrett as to the claim for civil conspiracy and this claim is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 12(c). (asni, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/9/2018.(asni, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The court GRANTS Defendants' Motion as to the claim for civil conspiracy without prejudice. The court DENIES Defendants&# 039; Motion as to the claims for outrage, negligence, gross negligence and negligence per se. The court further DENIES Defendants' Motion as to the alleged violation of 42 U.S.C. § 1981, but STRIKES the Fifth and Fourteenth Amendment claims from this cause of action. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/28/2017.(asni, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Bromell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John S Garrett
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Bromell, Jr
Represented By: William Pearce Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertiage Hauling Inc
Represented By: William Pearce Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Winburn
Represented By: William Pearce Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: William Pearce Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?