Jackson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Latasha Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2017cv02720
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Aiken
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA. The Commissioner is ordered to award Plaintiff $2,601.56 in attorney's fees and $22.27 in expenses. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/6/2018.(gnan )
June 20, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Court hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with a remand of the cause to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings. (gnan )
May 7, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It appears to the court that Plaintiff may wish to abandon this action. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue her appeal, she is ordered to file a brief in support of her appeal no later than May 14, 2018. Plaintiff is advised that if she fails to comply with this deadline, the undersigned may recommend that this matter be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/7/2018. (gnan, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Jackson
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?