Argrow v. Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc.

Plaintiff: Janet Argrow
Defendant: Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01756
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10 Reason: Filed in error by user. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 7/30/2019 (lbak)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Responses to Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc..(Butler, Tiffany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc..(Butler, Tiffany)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Report by Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc..(Butler, Tiffany)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Janet Argrow.(Polvi, Shannon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Janet Argrow.(Polvi, Shannon)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 7/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/24/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/24/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/25/2019, Discovery due by 1/22/2020, Motions due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/26/2019. (lbak)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint by Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc..(Duff, David) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/26/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc.. (lbak)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Bamberg Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-05-00113. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8514541), filed by Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Plaintiff) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argrow v. Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangeburg-Calhoun-Allendale-Bamberg Community Action Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Lorraine Butler
Represented By: David T Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Argrow
Represented By: Shannon Polvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?