Wilson v. City of Orangeburg et al
Plaintiff: Beverley D. Wilson
Defendant: Dean Felkel, Orangeburg Department of Public Works, Russell Strosnider, Mike Adams, John Yow, Michael Butler, Liz Keitt-Zimmerman, City of Orangeburg, City of Orangeburg County Council, Stillinger Body Shop, Inc. and Mack Stillinger, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02028
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #8 Order to Notify of Address Change, #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #10 Order, 13 Order, standard non-prisoner complaint form and blank summons placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Beverley D. Wilson, PO Box 21612, Charleston, SC 29413. (lbak) Modified on 8/26/2019 to edit text. (lbak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: In light of the return of mail addressed to Plaintiff's Orangeburg address, the Clerk of Court has changed Plaintiff's address of record to her Charleston address, which was also included on her complaint. Plaintiff's deadline to correct the defects in her complaint by filing an amended complaint is now September 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/26/19. (vhor)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Beverley D. Wilson. Document Returned: #10 Order,, Set Deadlines, #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Beverley D. Wilson, #8 Order to Notify of Address Change. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 Order, #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #8 Order to Notify of Address Change, standard non-prisoner complaint form, and blank summons placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Beverley D. Wilson, 1980 Broughton Street, Orangeburg, SC 29115 (bgoo)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE allowing Plaintiff an opportunity to correct the defects in her complaint by filing an amended complaint by August 28, 2019, along with any appropriate service documents. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified in this order, the undersigned will recommend that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/7/2019. (bgoo)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district judge deny Plaintiff's #3 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If the district judge accepts this recommendation, it is further recommended Plaintiff be allowed fourteen days from the date of the order denying indigent status to submit the required filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/7/2019. (bgoo)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/7/2019. (bgoo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Beverley D. Wilson. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Adams, Michael Butler, City of Orangeburg, City of Orangeburg County Council, Dean Felkel, Liz Keitt-Zimmerman, Orangeburg Department of Public Works, Mack Stillinger, Jr, Stillinger Body Shop, Inc., Russell Strosnider, John Yow, filed by Beverley D. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City of Orangeburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Felkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orangeburg Department of Public Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Strosnider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Keitt-Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Orangeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Orangeburg County Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stillinger Body Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Stillinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverley D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?