Jordan v. Berksteiner et al
Plaintiff: Everett J. Jordan
Defendant: XPO Drayage, Inc. and Daniel M. Berksteiner
Case Number: 5:2019cv02221
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 15 Order on Motion to Remand to Calhoun County Clerk of Court, ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Order on Motion to Remand, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Calhoun County Clerk of Court, PO Box 709, St Matthews, SC 29135-0709 (cbru, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/12/2019. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court.(cbru, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Remand by Daniel M. Berksteiner, XPO Drayage, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rheney, T)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 12. Reason: Proposed orders are not filed as motions. (cbru, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than September 17, 2019. (cbru, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/13/2019. (cbru, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/17/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/10/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/10/2019, Discovery due by 2/10/2020, Motion in Limine due by 5/22/2020, Motions due by 2/24/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/8/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/12/2020, Mediation Due by 4/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/13/2019. (cbru, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Daniel M. Berksteiner, XPO Drayage, Inc..(Rheney, T)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Calhoun County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acnkowledgment of State Court Clerk)(Rheney, T)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel M. Berksteiner, XPO Drayage, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories. (Rheney, T) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 8/8/2019 (cbru, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Daniel M. Berksteiner, XPO Drayage, Inc.(cbru, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calhoun County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-09-00098 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8602614) filed by XPO Drayage, Inc., Daniel M. Berksteiner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Berksteiner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Drayage, Inc.
Represented By: T David Rheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Berksteiner
Represented By: T David Rheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett J. Jordan
Represented By: Carl Lewis Solomon
Represented By: Reginald C Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?