Rhodes v. Stirling et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes
Defendant: Joseph McFadden, Bryan Stirling, Tiffany Ravenell, James Blackwell, Fracine Bachman, Larry Cooper and Ms Birch
Case Number: 5:2019cv03231
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
2 Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 24 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes (glev, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 24 Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes. Response to Motion due by 1/16/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.(prou, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendation by Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes. Reply to Objections due by 1/6/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lsut, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Jonathan Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 17 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes, 343817, Perry Correctional Institution, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC 29669. (prou, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections re #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes. Objections to #12 Report and Recommendation due by 12/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/05/2019. (bedw)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.(prou, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, by Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.(prou, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #10 Order - 1983 - No Service w/NEF, 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes, 343817, Perry Correctional Institution, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC 29669. (prou, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that the court dismiss the complaint without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/22/2019. (prou, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #10 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/22/2019.(prou, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/22/2019. (prou, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (prou, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fracine Bachman, Ms Birch, James Blackwell, Larry Cooper, Joseph McFadden, Tiffany Ravenell, Bryan Stirling, filed by Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes. Service due by 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Ravenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fracine Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Donell Edwards Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?