Brawner v. Wilson
Petitioner: James Randall Brawner
Respondent: Alan Wilson and Warden Lee Correctional Institution
Case Number: 5:2019cv03534
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to James Randall Brawner, #249198, LCI, 990 Wisacky Hwy., Bishopville, SC, 29010. (prou, )
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Any objections to the Report and Recommendation shall be filed by March 2, 2020. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 2/13/2020.(prou, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by James Randall Brawner. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.(prou, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #15 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to James Randall Brawner, #249198, LCI, 990 Wisacky Hwy., Bishopville, SC, 29010. (prou, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that the court dismiss this Petition without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/28/2020. (prou, )
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(prou, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY by James Randall Brawner to #9 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #9 Proper Form Order w/NEF, 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to James Randall Brawner, #249198, LCI, 990 Wisacky Hwy., Bishopville, SC, 29010 (dsto, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #9 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/23/2019.(dsto, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 1/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/23/2019. (dsto, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (prou, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by James Randall Brawner. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Randall Brawner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James R Brawner, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Letter from James R Brawner, #4 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brawner v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Randall Brawner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Lee Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?