Blair v. Sims et al
Plaintiff: Marcus A Blair
Defendant: Major Ocean, Cpt Martin, Lt Figrow and Officer Sims
Case Number: 5:2020cv02090
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #18 Order 1983 w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Marcus A Blair, #329604, Kirkland Reception and Evaluation Center, 4344 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210. (mcot, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Lt Figrow, Cpt Martin, Major Ocean, Officer Sims. Service due by 9/17/2020. (prou, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER authorizing service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/19/2020. (prou, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Marcus Blair. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Marcus Blair. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)(prou, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #10 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Summons, and four USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Marcus A. Blair, #329604, Kirkland Reception and Evaluation Center, 4344 Broad River Road, Columbia, SC 29210. (prou, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #10 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/9/2020.(prou, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 6/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/9/2020. (prou, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (prou, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Marcus A Blair. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2020: #2 Financial Certificate, #3 Envelope) (prou, ).
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lt Figrow, Cpt Martin, Major Ocean, Officer Sims, filed by Marcus A Blair. Service due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Sims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus A Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Ocean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Figrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?