Bagley v. James
Petitioner: Bernard Bagley
Respondent: Bryan Stirling, Alan M Wilson and Tonya James
Case Number: 5:2020cv03013
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Referring Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina June Catoe Bigelow on behalf of Tonya James (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bigelow, Christina June)
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bernard Bagley re #18 Supplement (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(prou, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Tonya James. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT by Bernard Bagley to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Richland County Fifth Judicial Public Index, #2 Envelope)(prou, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #16 Order 2241 SCDC Service w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Bernard Bagley, #175851, Kershaw Correctional Institution, 4848 Goldmine Highway, Kershaw, SC 29067. (prou, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(prou, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 400014759. (gnan )
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #8 Proper Form Order w/NEF and Form AO 240, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Bernard Bagley, #175851, Kershaw Correctional Institution, 4848 Goldmine Highway, Kershaw, SC 29067. (prou, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/25/2020. (prou, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (prou, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bernard Bagley. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Bernard Bagley, #2 Envelope)(prou, ) Modified on 9/24/2020; see document #18 for Supplement (prou, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley v. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bernard Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alan M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tonya James
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Represented By: Christina June Catoe Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?