Blume v. Azar
Plaintiff: Patricia G. Blume
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 5:2020cv03684
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Patricia G. Blume. (Tinsley, Mark)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than November 19, 2020. (cbru, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Response to Motion due by 11/30/2020) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/30/2020.(cbru, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Patricia G. Blume. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tinsley, Mark) Modified to correct motion relief on 10/30/2020 (cbru, ).
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alex M. Azar, II. Response to Motion due by 11/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Unfavorable Decision from QIC)No proposed order.(Newman, Christie)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alex M. Azar, II.(Newman, Christie)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant is reminded that Local Rule 26.01 includes Interrogatories F and G which are directed to defendants only. Please file an answer to Interrogatory G no later than November 4, 2020. (cbru, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alex M. Azar, II.(cbru, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bamberg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-05-00156 (Filing fee waived) filed by Alex M. Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blume v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia G. Blume
Represented By: Mark B Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Christie V Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?