Gibson v. Spartanburg County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Timothy W Gibson and Timothy Wayne Gibson,
Defendant: Spartanburg County Detention Center, Chuck Wright, Major Freeman and Captain Hayes
Case Number: 5:2021cv01141
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #17 Order 1983 w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Timothy W Gibson, #153892, Spartanburg County Detention Center, 950 California Avenue, Spartanburg, SC 29303. (prou, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Major Freeman, Captain Hayes, Spartanburg County Detention Center, Chuck Wright. Service due by 8/2/2021. (prou, )
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER authorizing service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 5/3/2021. (prou, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 11 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #10 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Summons, and three USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Timothy W Gibson, #153892, Spartanburg County Detention Center, 950 California Avenue, Spartanburg, SC 29303. (prou, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #10 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/21/2021.(prou, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 5/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/21/2021. (prou, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (prou, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Timothy W Gibson. Response to Motion due by 4/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Major Freeman, Captain Hayes, Spartanburg County Detention Center, Chuck Wright, filed by Timothy W Gibson. Service due by 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Spartanburg County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wayne Gibson,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?