Pabon v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Liliana Irizarry Pabon
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record and US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Case Number: 5:2021cv03141
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/21/2021. (gnan )
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Liliana Irizarry Pabon. (McChesney, Paul) Modified on 10/21/21 to correct event type. (gnan )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David B. Goetz is added Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Liliana Irizarry Pabon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/7/2021.(gnan )
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Goetz ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10112442) by Liliana Irizarry Pabon. Response to Motion due by 10/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(McChesney, Paul)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 9/28/2021.(gnan )
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Social Security Appeals Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website.* Not later than thirty days from the entry of this Text Order, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a (1) signed and completed Notice, Consent, and Reference of the Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, or (2) status report informing the Court Plaintiff withholds consent to disposition of Plaintiff's appeal by a United States Magistrate Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. *https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing_Order_Regarding_Social_Security_Cases.pdf Entered at the direction of Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/27/2021.
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Standing Order 3:21-mc-00212-RBH signed by Chief Judge R. Bryan Harwell, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on or by 3/28/2022. (gnan, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Liliana Irizarry Pabon. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2021. No proposed order. Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(gnan )
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Liliana Irizarry Pabon.(gnan )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pabon v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Irizarry Pabon
Represented By: Paul Townsend McChesney
Represented By: David B Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Attorney - Social Security Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?