Patel et al v. Jaddou
Plaintiff: Pankajbhai Jayantilal Patel and Aisha Patel
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Case Number: 5:2021cv03162
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. (Ur Jaddou answer due 2/28/2022) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 11/19/2021.(cbru, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ur Jaddou. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Holmes, Martin) Modified to correct motion relief on 11/19/2021 (cbru, ).
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ur Jaddou.(Holmes, Martin)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pankajbhai Jayantilal Patel, Aisha Patel. Ur Jaddou served on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons Returned Executed)(Banias, Bradley)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ur Jaddou. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney, #2 U.S. Attorney General)(cbru, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aisha Patel, Pankajbhai Jayantilal Patel.(cbru, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10099940) filed by Pankajbhai Jayantilal Patel, Aisha Patel. Service due by 12/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CHS Processing Times)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pankajbhai Jayantilal Patel
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aisha Patel
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Represented By: Martin L Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?