Brown v. Charleston County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Margie Brown
Defendant: Charleston County Sheriff's Department, Tracey Matthews, Joseph Dempsey, Kari Maratea, North Charleston Police Department, Christopher Cooper, Alexander Johnson, Michael Kornahrens and McPherson
Case Number: 5:2021cv03494
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 22 Text Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Complaint form, Summons, and nine USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Margie Brown, PO Box 72122, North Charleston, SC 29418. (prou, )
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the Court for consideration of the Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint and Motion for Extension of time filed by Plaintiff on November 18, 2021. ECF No. #20 . Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint and Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order (plus three days for mail time) to submit to the court an amended complaint along with any appropriate service documents. The amended complaint must be clearly written and must contain all of Plaintiff's allegations and claims against all of her intended defendants. The names of all intended defendants must be clearly written in the caption of the amended complaint. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with a blank complaint form and service documents, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/8/2021.(prou, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Margie Brown, PO Box 72122, North Charleston, SC 29418. Document Returned: 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #14 Proper Form Order. (prou, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Proper Form Order, ( Response to Motion due by 12/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Margie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENTS RE-MAILED: 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #14 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Summons, and nine USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Margie Brown, PO Box 72122, North Charleston, SC 29418. (prou, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Margie Brown from Margie Brown, 3317 North Charleston Apts, North Charleston, SC 29405 **TO** Margie Brown, PO Box 72122, North Charleston, SC 29418. (prou, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #14 Proper Form Order w/NEF, Summons, and nine USM-285 Forms placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Margie Brown, 3317 North Charleston Apts, North Charleston, SC 29405. (prou, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #14 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/26/2021.(prou, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/26/2021. (prou, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 5 Reason: Document entered in error. (prou, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Margie Brown. Response to Motion due by 11/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Margie Brown.(prou, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charleston County Sheriff's Department, Christopher Cooper, Joseph Dempsey, Alexander Johnson, Michael Kornahrens, Kari Maratea, Tracey Matthews, McPherson, North Charleston Police Department, filed by Margie Brown. Service due by 1/24/2022.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Charleston County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Maratea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Charleston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kornahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?