Brown v. Warden of Perry Correctional Inst
Petitioner: Larry D Brown
Respondent: Warden of Perry Correctional Inst
Case Number: 5:2022cv00352
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 13 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Larry D. Brown, #244139, Perry Correctional Institution, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC 29669. (prou, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Respondent's Motion for Extension, ECF No. #12 , is granted; the response to the Petition is now due May 5, 2022. The court notes that Petitioner is proceeding pro se, and the Motion's reference to consent by "opposing counsel" appears to have been inadvertent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/4/2022.(prou, )
April 1, 2022 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time by Warden of Perry Correctional Inst. Response to Motion due by 4/15/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Maye, William)
February 15, 2022 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Warden of Perry Correctional Inst. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 Order 2254 w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Larry D. Brown, #244139, Perry Correctional Institution, 430 Oaklawn Road, Pelzer, SC 29669. (prou, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER authorizing service of process. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 4/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(prou, )
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Spartanburg. (prou, )
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt number SCX300097490.), filed by Larry D Brown. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Warden of Perry Correctional Inst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Perry Correctional Inst
Represented By: William Joseph Maye
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?