Buckman v. Dejoy
Plaintiff: Tammy Buckman
Defendant: Louis Dejoy
Case Number: 5:2022cv01019
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tammy Buckman. Service due by 8/8/2022 (Ferguson, Emmanuel)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheria Akins Clarke on behalf of Louis Dejoy (Clarke, Sheria)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The undersigned grants counsel Emmanuel Ferguson's #6 request for protection from court appearances for the following dates in 2022: - April 25, 2022 through April 29, 2022; - May 23, 2022 through May 27, 2022; - June 27, 2022 through July 1, 2022;- July 18, 2022 through July 22, 2022;- August 15, 2022 through August 19, 2022;- September 19, 2022 through September 23, 2022;- October 17, 2022 through October 21, 2022;- November 14, 2022 through November 18, 2022; and- December 19, 2022 through December 23, 2022. Please note that such protection is from court appearances only and does not excuse Plaintiff from complying with court deadlines. Also note that this order applies to the undersigned only and not to the district judge. Protection from the district judge assigned to the case should be sought from her directly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/12/2022. (prou, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Emmanuel Ferguson, I for multiple (Ferguson, Emmanuel)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Louis Dejoy. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (prou, )
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demaand by Tammy Buckman.(prou, )
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis Dejoy ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10418429.), filed by Tammy Buckman. Service due by 6/28/2022.(prou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckman v. Dejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Buckman
Represented By: Emmanuel Ferguson, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Dejoy
Represented By: Sheria Akins Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?