Mealing v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Bridges A Mealing
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 6:2008cv02478
Filed: July 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Edgefield
Presiding Judge: William M Catoe
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Attorney Fees per Rule 406b Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/18/2010.(aste)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $4,792.90, expenses in the amount of $16.00, and costs in the amount of $7.00. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/5/09.(jtho, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting 31 Report and Recommendations. The Commissioner's decision is reversed under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g), with a remand of the cause to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/14/09. (jtho, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mealing v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridges A Mealing
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?