Twitty v. Nationwide Insurance Comp et al
Plaintiff: Irving E Twitty
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Comp, Patricia Dugan, Cherylon Dean, Dennis Gillilan, Alicia Cornelius, Wanda W Smith, Tijuana L Crisp, Owner of Jeep Grand Cherokee Jeep, Geoffrey W Gibbon, Grenville D Morgan, Jr and John C Few
Case Number: 6:2009cv02381
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Magistrate Judge's 42 Report and Recommendations is adopted and the Complaint is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction without issuance and service of process. Additionally, the Plaintiff's other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 10/24/2011. (hcic)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350, Motions terminated: granting [ 29] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) filed by Irving E Twitty, denying 28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Irving E Twitty, denying 27 MOTION Request for Processing and Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Irving E Twitty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 8/8/2011. (jpet, )
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/23/2009. (jpet, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting 10 Report and Recommendations, the Plaintiff shall have 15 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. If he fails to do so, the clerk shall enter an order of dismissal without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/4/2009. (jpet, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice, re 1 Complaint, filed by Irving E Twitty, MOTIONS TERMINATED: denying 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) and ordering that the plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to pay the filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 10/1/2009. (jpet, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitty v. Nationwide Insurance Comp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving E Twitty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Comp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherylon Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gillilan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tijuana L Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owner of Jeep Grand Cherokee Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey W Gibbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grenville D Morgan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Few
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?