Keystone Northeast Inc v. Keystone Retaining Wall Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Keystone Northeast Inc
Defendant: Keystone Retaining Wall Systems Inc and Contech Construction Products Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv00720
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the plaintiff Keystone Northeast, Inc. recover from the defendant Keystone Retaining Wall Systems, LLC., the amount of Seven Hundred Twenty Five Thousand, Seven Hundred Seventy Five dollars and 00 /100 ($725,775.00), plus prejudgment interest in the amount of Two Hundred Three Thousand, One Hundred Forty dollars and 00/100 ($203,140.00), together with post judgment interest at the rate of.26%. Each party is to bear their own costs. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 4/1/2015 (abuc).
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 OPINION AND ORDER, Plaintiff shall be entitled to a judgment of $725,775 in past damages under the three Transfer Agreements; Plaintiff shall be entitled to prejudgment interest in the amount of $203,140. The Court r einstates the 1999 Gagne Transfer Agreement, the 2000 Jandris Transfer Agreement, and the 2000 Hi-Way Transfer Agreement, effective immediately. Defendants are ordered to make payments due under these agreements effective March 1, 2015. Plaintiffs remaining claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/31/2015. (gpre, )
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPINION AND ORDER denying 127 Motion in Limine; denying 133 Motion Exclude Testimony of Proposed Expert WItness John Markel by Contech Construction Products LLC; granting 134 Motion for Reconsideration, granting 134 Motion Clarification of Order on Summary Judgment to the extent set forth in this Order; granting 135 Motion for Reconsideration to the extent set forth in this Order. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/25/2015.(abuc)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 110 Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent set forth within the Order. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/16/2015.(abuc)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER EXTENDING TIME to accommodate the completion of a desposition. Deadline extended up to and including 1/28/15. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/23/2015. (abuc)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION AND ORDER granting 82 Motion for Attorney Fees as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/22/2014.(mbro, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keystone Northeast Inc v. Keystone Retaining Wall Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone Northeast Inc
Represented By: Paul E Hammack
Represented By: James Alexander Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Retaining Wall Systems Inc
Represented By: Thomas Edward Vanderbloemen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contech Construction Products Inc
Represented By: Thomas Edward Vanderbloemen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?