Brooks et al v. Field et al
Plaintiff: Harold Brooks, Clara Louise Brooks, Benjamin Brooks, William F Tomz and Sharon Finch
Defendant: Arthur M Field and Frederick Scott Pfeiffer
Case Number: 6:2014cv02267
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 280 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs 273 motion to voluntarily dismiss Pfeiffer without prejudice is granted, Pfeiffers 169 motion for summary judgment is moot, and Pfeiffers 193 motion for sanctions is moot. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/2/2016. (gpre, )
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopts Report and Recommendation 157 , and adopts in part the Report and Recommendation 199 . Fields motion to compel arbitration 97 is DENIED, Fields motion to abstain 110 is D ENIED, Fields motion to compel arbitration and stay discovery 156 is DENIED, and Plaintiffs motion to dismiss counterclaims 109 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Fields cause of action for civil conspiracy is dismissed. However, Fields remaining causes of action set forth in his substitute counterclaim 101 may proceed. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/25/2016. (gpre, )
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopts 50 Report and Recommendation, 24 Motion to Dismiss denied. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/18/2015. Modified on 3/18/2015 to remove attachment (gpre, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Field et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Brooks
Represented By: Gene McCain Connell, Jr
Represented By: Rodney F Pillsbury
Represented By: John M Read, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Louise Brooks
Represented By: Gene McCain Connell, Jr
Represented By: Rodney F Pillsbury
Represented By: John M Read, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Brooks
Represented By: Gene McCain Connell, Jr
Represented By: Rodney F Pillsbury
Represented By: John M Read, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Tomz
Represented By: Gene McCain Connell, Jr
Represented By: Rodney F Pillsbury
Represented By: John M Read, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Finch
Represented By: Gene McCain Connell, Jr
Represented By: Rodney F Pillsbury
Represented By: John M Read, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur M Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Scott Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?