Alexander v. Cartledge
Petitioner: John Douglas Alexander
Respondent: Leroy Cartledge
Case Number: 6:2016cv00600
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Abbeville
Presiding Judge: Kevin McDonald
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 69 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying as moot 76 Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/3/17.(kmca)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 58 . IT IS ORDERED that Respondents motion for summary judgment, docket number 12, is granted and Alexanders habeas petition is dismissed with prejudice without an evidentiary h earing. It is further ORDERED that Petitioners motion for default judgment, docket number 15, is denied. It is further ORDERED that Petitioners motion for a ertificate of appealability, docket number 58, is denied because Petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/28/2017. (kric, )
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 49 . ORDERED that Respondents motion for summary judgment, docket number 12 , is granted, and the habeas petition, docket number 1 , is denied. It is further ORDERED that Petitioners motion for default judgment, docket number 15 , is denied, and Petitioners motion for summary judgment, docket number 16 , is denied. It is further ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is denied because Petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/1/2017. (kric, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Douglas Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leroy Cartledge
Represented By: Donald John Zelenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?