T&S Brass and Bronze Works Inc et al v. Slanina et al
Plaintiff: T&S Brass and Bronze Works Inc and EnviroPure Systems LLC
Defendant: James Slanina, Linda Basinger and Advantagreen
Counter_claimant: Advantagreen, Linda Basinger and James Slanina
Counter_defendant: James Slanina
Case Number: 6:2016cv03687
Filed: November 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 207 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Final Judgment of Non-Dischargeability)(abuc)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER adopting as modified 66 Report and Recommendation.; granting as modified 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 168 Motion to Sever and Stay all Claims and to Compel Arbitration; granting as modified [29 ] Motion to Amend/Correct 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, rendering as moot 135 for Leave to File Supplemental Materials in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket Entries 16 and 29 ) and Second Motion for TRO (Docket Entry 72 ) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 5/4/17.(alew, ) Modified on 5/4/2017 to edit text (alew, ).
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER ADOPTING 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, denying 72 Motion for TRO, filed by T&S Brass and Bronze Works Inc, EnviroPure Systems LLC. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/9/2017. (abuc)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting as modified 118 Motion for Entry of Protocol for Searches of Electronic Devices. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 2/15/2017.(abuc) Modified to edit text on 2/15/2017 (abuc).
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 98 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/12/2017.(abuc) Modified to remove duplicative text on 1/12/2017 (abuc). (Main Document 107 replaced on 1/12/2017) (abuc, ).
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Consent MOTION For Entry of Order for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Taylor and Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Taylor Without Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/16/2016.(abuc)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Amend Amended Motion to Amend; finding as moot 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 29 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/14/2016.(abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T&S Brass and Bronze Works Inc et al v. Slanina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T&S Brass and Bronze Works Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey P Dunlaevy
Represented By: Steven R LeBlanc
Represented By: Brian P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EnviroPure Systems LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P Dunlaevy
Represented By: Steven R LeBlanc
Represented By: Brian P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Slanina
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Basinger
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantagreen
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Advantagreen
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Linda Basinger
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: James Slanina
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: James Slanina
Represented By: David E Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?