Knox v. Klimbal et al
Plaintiff: Tito Knox
Defendant: Elena Klimbal and Officer Graham
Case Number: 6:2017cv00713
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION & ORDER denying Knox's 42 untimely objections, construed as a motion to alter or amend the judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 10/30/2017. (bgoo)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER adopting the 33 Report and Recommendation and dismissing Plaintiff's case with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 10/16/2017. (bgoo)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION & ORDER providing Knox twenty (20) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint in this case. Further, the case is remanded to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Amended Complaint due by 9/12/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 8/23/2017. (bgoo)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER adopting the 14 Report and Recommendation and summarily dismissing the complaint without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr. on 5/3/2017. (bgoo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Klimbal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tito Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Klimbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?