Workman v. Metro PCS Mobile Phone Company et al
Plaintiff: Olandio Ray Workman
Defendant: Metro PCS Mobile Phone Company, Mr Richardson, Metro PCS and Metro PCS Mobile
Case Number: 6:2017cv01208
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 66 . The Court ADOPTS the R & R [ECF No. 66], LIFTS the stay, and DISMISSES Plaintiffs claims for monetary damages against Defendant Richardson and against Defendant Lewis in his individual capacity without prejudice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 12/27/2018. (kric, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 36 47 . the Court ADOPTS AS MODIFIED the Magistrate Judges Reportsand & Recommendations [ECF Nos. 36 & 47]. The Court DISMISSES without prejudice DefendantsMetro PCS Mobile Phone Company and the Greenville County Sheriffs Office, DISMISSES Plaintiffs claim for damages against Defendant Lewis in his official capacity, and STAYS Plaintiffs claims for damages against Defendant Richardson and against Defendant Lewis in h is individual capacity until the conclusion of Plaintiffs state criminal proceedings. Plaintiff shall notify and file sufficient documentation with the Court verifying when his state criminal proceedings have concluded. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 7/17/2018. (kric, )
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 9 . The Court dismisses this case without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 6/26/2017. (kric, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workman v. Metro PCS Mobile Phone Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olandio Ray Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro PCS Mobile Phone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro PCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro PCS Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?