Porter v. Span-America Medical Systems Inc et al

Plaintiff: Charles Porter
Defendant: Span- America Medical Systems Inc, Thomas D Henrion, James D Ferguson, Thomas F Grady, Richard C Coggins, Robert H Dick, Dan R Lee, Linda D Norman, Thomas Sullivan and Terry Allison Rappuhn
Case Number: 6:2017cv01357
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Greenville Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CLOSING AND TERMINATING THE ACTIONS Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/7/2017. (abuc)
July 11, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED ORDER REGARDING THE STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 7/11/2017. (abuc)
June 5, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 MOTION to Withdraw 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Hearing filed by Charles Porter. Motions terminated: 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Hearing filed by Charles Porter. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 6/5/2017. (abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Span-America Medical Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Porter
Represented By: Andrew Addison Mathias
Represented By: Sima Bhakta Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Span- America Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D Henrion
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Ferguson
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F Grady
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C Coggins
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H Dick
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan R Lee
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda D Norman
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sullivan
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Allison Rappuhn
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?