Glenn v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Demetriss A Glenn
Defendant: A/W Robinson, Brian Stirling and Ofc Jackson
Case Number: 6:2018cv03179
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
0 Judge: Donald C Coggins
1 Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. Answer due 3/1/2019 per letter extending time. (kric, )
January 16, 2019 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer placed in U.S. Mail to Demetriss A Glenn (kric, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order 19 TEXT ORDER granting the defendants' #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 3/1/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/16/19.(ctuc, )
January 15, 2019 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ofc Jackson, A/W Robinson, Brian Stirling. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(McDade, James)
December 26, 2018 16 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (kric, )
December 21, 2018 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order 1983, placed in U.S. Mail to Demetriss A. Glenn (gpre, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER authorizing service of process. Apprising the defendants of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff's #11 motion for the appointment of counsel is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/20/2018. (gpre, )
December 17, 2018 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel from Demetriss Glenn regarding case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, ) Modified on 12/20/2018 to change event type (kcam, ).
December 4, 2018 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Demetriss A Glenn with blank summons and 3 blank USM285 forms as directed. (kric, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/27/18. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/4/18. (ctuc, )
November 26, 2018 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (kric, )
November 26, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Demetriss A Glenn. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
November 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Demetriss A Glenn. Service due by 2/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Additional Statement, #2 Inmate Requests, #3 Envelope)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A/W Robinson
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stirling
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc Jackson
Represented By: James Victor McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetriss A Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?