Islam v. Speedway, LLC
Plaintiff: Shafiqul Islam
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv03270
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/22/19, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 4/22/19, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/22/19, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/22/19, Discovery due by 6/21/19, Motions due by 7/5/19, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/5/19, Jury Selection Deadline 9/4/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/17/19. (ctuc, )
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/17/19.(ctuc, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Speedway, LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Foster, William)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Speedway, LLC.(Foster, William)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Shafiqul Islam.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Speedway, LLC., Shafiqul Islam (Foster, William) Modified on 1/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Speedway, LLC., Shafiqul Islam (Foster, William) Modified on 1/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway, LLC.(Foster, William)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 5/29/2019, Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/7/2018. (kric, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/27/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/11/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 1/11/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/22/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/22/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/22/2019, Discovery due by 5/22/2019, Motions due by 6/5/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/5/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 8/5/2019, Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/7/2018. (kric, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shafiqul Islam.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk. Plaintiff's LR26.01 interrogatories are due by 12/20/2018. (kric, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Speedway, LLC.(kric, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CP2305541. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8142714), filed by Speedway, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing Removal)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Islam v. Speedway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Represented By: William H Foster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shafiqul Islam
Represented By: Jeremy Randall Summerlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?