Maddonna v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al

Plaintiff: Aimee Maddonna
Defendant: Joan B Meacham, Administration for Children and Families, Steven Wagner, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M Azar, II and Henry McMaster
Case Number: 6:2019cv00448
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joan B Meacham. Response to Motion due by 4/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 4/16/2019. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 4/1/19.(kmca)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Aimee Maddonna. Response to Motion due by 4/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Kozloski, Aaron)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry McMaster.(kmca) Removed from #12 Motion to Dismiss and re-filed by clerk. (kmca)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Henry McMaster. Response to Motion due by 4/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A: Letter from Gov. McMaster to HHS, #3 Exhibit B: Executive Order No. 2018-12, #4 Exhibit C: Response letter from HHS to Gov. McMaster, # (5) LR 26.01 Answers)No proposed order.(Coleman, Miles) Modified on 3/19/2019: to remove Exhibit 5 and file as #15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (kmca).
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Joan B Meacham answer due 4/9/2019. (Woodington, Kenneth)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Maddonna. Administration for Children and Families served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; Alex M Azar, II served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; Steven Wagner served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(kmca) Re-filed by clerk to correct event and add cover page (kmca)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Maddonna. Henry McMaster served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019; Joan B Meacham served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Kozloski, Aaron) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/18/2019: to replace with corrected document (cover page) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 3/18/2019: #1 Proof of Service) (kmca).
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Kenneth D Upton Jr, Richard B Katskee and Alison Tanner added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 2/22/19.(kmca)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alison Tanner ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8282863) by Aimee Maddonna. Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Alison Tanner, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kozloski, Aaron)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard B. Katskee ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8282834) by Aimee Maddonna. Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richard B. Katskee, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kozloski, Aaron)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth D. Upton, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8282787) by Aimee Maddonna. Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kenneth D. Upton, Jr., #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kozloski, Aaron)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Administration for Children and Families, Alex M Azar, II; Henry McMaster, Joan B Meacham, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kmca)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aimee Maddonna.(kmca)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administration for Children and Families, Alex M Azar, II; Henry McMaster, Joan B Meacham, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Steven Wagner (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8272089), filed by Aimee Maddonna. Service due by 5/16/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddonna v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan B Meacham
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry McMaster
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Represented By: Ethan Jonathan Bercot
Represented By: Jay Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Miles Edward Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Maddonna
Represented By: Aaron J Kozloski
Represented By: Kenneth Dale Upton, Jr
Represented By: Richard B Katskee
Represented By: Alison Ann Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?