Rabo AgriFinance LLC v. Ollis et al
Plaintiff: Rabo AgriFinance LLC
Defendant: James Edwin Ollis and J Ollis Farms LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01329
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Order, 26.01 Interrogatories, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to James Edwin Ollis 2450 Garden Road Ware Shoals, SC 29692 (gpre, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER On June 6, 2019, the Court directed defendant James Edwin Ollis to complete, sign, and return Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.) Answers to Interrogatories by June 27, 2019 (doc. 10). Defendant Ollis has not complied the order. As such the Court is providing defendant Ollis with a final opportunity to comply with its order. Accordingly, pro se defendant Ollis is directed to complete, sign, and return the attached Pro Se Party's Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories to the Court by 7/15/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Defendant Ollis is ordered to notify the Clerk in writing of any change of address. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/3/19. (ctuc, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail to James Edwin Ollis with LR26.01 interrogatories and public docket sheet as directed. (kric, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing pro se defendant, James Edwin Ollis, to complete, sign, and return the attached Pro Se Party's Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories to the Court by 6/27/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Ordering defendant Ollis to notify the Clerk in writing of any change of address. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/6/19. (ctuc, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 6 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge(Non-Consent), 7 Notice Change of Case Number, placed in U.S. Mail to James Edwin Ollis (kmca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number 6-19-cv-1329-TMC-KFM. Please make a note of it for all future filings as well as Judge's preferences. (kmca)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald pursuant to LR 73.02. (kmca)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James Edwin Ollis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmca) Modified on 6/6/2019: NOTE: first sentence of page 3 is cut-off. (kmca).
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to J Ollis Farms LLC, James Edwin Ollis. (Attachments: #1 Summons J Ollis Farms LLC)(kmca)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rabo AgriFinance LLC.(kmca)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J Ollis Farms LLC, James Edwin Ollis (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8430113), filed by Rabo AgriFinance LLC. Service due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Confirmation, #2 Exhibit 2 Bankruptcy Court Order Dismissing Chapter 12 Case, #3 Exhibit 3 Operating Line of Credit Note, #4 Exhibit 4 Credit Agreement, part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Credit Agreement, part 2, #6 Exhibit 5 Borrowing Base Certificates, #7 Exhibit 6 Financial Statements, #8 Exhibit 7 First Amendment to Credit Agreement and Other Loan Documents)(kmca) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/8/2019: to replace with corrected document (converted pdf) as provided by filing user) (kmca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabo AgriFinance LLC v. Ollis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edwin Ollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ollis Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabo AgriFinance LLC
Represented By: Constance L Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?