Nelson v. PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC
Plaintiff: Kaleb Nelson
Defendant: PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01387
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/26/19. (kmca)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/16/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/30/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/30/2019, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 7/30/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/8/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/8/2019, Discovery due by 12/9/2019, Motions due by 12/23/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/26/19. (kmca)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC.(Wilkerson, John) Modified on 6/25/2019: to remove duplicate text (Defendant PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency, LLC's Answers to D.S.C. Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories)(kmca).
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Class Action Complaint by PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC.(Wilkerson, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Avi Kaufman added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/4/19.(kmca)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Avi Kaufman ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8462105) by Kaleb Nelson. Response to Motion due by 6/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit FL Good Standing)No proposed order.(Nettles, Christopher) Modified on 5/23/2019: to correct name of Attachment #1 (kmca). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/4/2019: to replace with corrected document (from Florida Supreme Court) as provided by filing user) (kmca). Modified on 6/4/2019: to correct typo (Avi Kaufman) (kmca).
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaleb Nelson. PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Nettles, Christopher) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/29/2019: to replace with corrected document (cover page) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 5/29/2019: #1 Affidavit of Service) (kmca).
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC. (kmca)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kaleb Nelson.(kmca)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8439384), filed by Kaleb Nelson. Service due by 8/12/2019.(kmca) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/14/2019: to replace with corrected document (attorney signature block) as provided by filing user) (kmca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC Home & Auto Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: John Smith Wilkerson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleb Nelson
Represented By: Christopher Tyson Nettles
Represented By: Avi R Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?