Mancuso v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lori V Mancuso
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01705
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/9/19. (sfla)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Lori V Mancuso (Bax, Nathaniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori V Mancuso. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Lori V Mancuso. Service due by 9/12/2019 (Bax, Nathaniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (sfla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lori V Mancuso.(sfla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8504226) filed by Lori V Mancuso. Service due by 9/12/2019. (sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancuso v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori V Mancuso
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?