Heuer v. Wecker et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Heuer
Defendant: Andreas Wecker and Andreas Seed Oil
Case Number: 6:2019cv01721
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/22/2019. Referenced in Order #14 (gpre, ) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit text (gpre, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #1 Complaint, #15 Summons Issued, #14 Order Service - Non-Inmate, 17 Text Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Stephen Heuer 160 Dewey Road Greer, SC 29651 with service packets for 2 defendants (kric, ) Modified on 7/31/2019 to add text order referenced in proper form order (gpre, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Andreas Seed Oil, Andreas Wecker. (kric, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/22/2019. (kric, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number SCX600008313 (gpre, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED (second time) #8 Proper Form Order, Court's Special Interrogatories, AO239 Long Form, USM-285 Forms (2) placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Stephen Heuer 160 Dewey Road Greer, SC 29651 (gpre, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, Special Interrogatories, AO239 Long Form, USM-285 forms (2) placed in U.S. Mail to Stephen Heuer (gpre, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Noticing the Plaintiff regarding representation of corporation. Case to be brought into proper form by 7/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Special Interrogatories)(gpre, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stephen Heuer.(gpre, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Stephen Heuer. Response to Motion due by 7/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andreas Seed Oil, Andreas Wecker, filed by Stephen Heuer. Service due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement no page 14)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heuer v. Wecker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Heuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas Wecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas Seed Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?