McKee v. Companion Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kevin McKee
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv01772
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/16/19. (sfla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; Joint Stipulation Deadline 10/9/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/16/19. (sfla)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Companion Life Insurance Company.(Willard, Theodore)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Companion Life Insurance Company.(Willard, Theodore)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin McKee. Companion Life Insurance Company served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Companion Life Insurance Company. (abuc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kevin McKee.(abuc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Companion Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8518221.), filed by Kevin McKee. Service due by 9/19/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. Companion Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McKee
Represented By: Melissa Leila Louzri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?