Naji v. Fluor Federal Services LLC
Plaintiff: Inam Naji
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises Inc and Fluor Federal Services, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01774
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/7/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/21/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/11/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/11/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/12/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/12/2019, Discovery due by 1/13/2020, Motions due by 3/13/2020, Mediation Due by 2/12/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magirate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/17/2019. (gpre, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Inam Naji.(Dunlaevy, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Fluor Federal Services, LLC.(Cluverius, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fluor Federal Services, LLC, filed by Inam Naji. Service due by 9/30/2019 (Dunlaevy, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/1/2019.(kric, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Inam Naji. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dunlaevy, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's answers to local rule 26.01 interrogatories are due no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the notice of removal. (gpre, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fluor Enterprises Inc.(gpre, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-23-02538. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8518352), filed by Fluor Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naji v. Fluor Federal Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Jennifer S Cluverius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Federal Services, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Robertson Parr
Represented By: Jennifer S Cluverius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inam Naji
Represented By: Jeffrey P Dunlaevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?