Whitney v. Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina
Plaintiff: Nicholas Whitney
Defendant: Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina
Case Number: 6:2019cv01828
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Stipulation Deadline 11/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 7/23/19. (kmca)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina.(Willard, Theodore)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina.(Willard, Theodore)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Whitney. Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina. (kmca)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nicholas Whitney.(kmca)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8528383), filed by Nicholas Whitney. Service due by 9/25/2019.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney v. Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Whitney
Represented By: Melissa Leila Louzri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross BlueShield of South Carolina
Represented By: Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?