Hernandez v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Willie Mena Hernandez
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Record
Case Number: 6:2019cv01919
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Mena Hernandez. Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 7/24/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Certified Rcpt: Commissioner of SSA, #2 Supporting Documents Certified Rcpt: Civil Process Clerk, #3 Supporting Documents Certified Rcpt: US Atty General)(Duggan, John)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting the plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/10/19.(ctuc, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jsmi, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Willie Mena Hernandez. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(jsmi, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Willie Mena Hernandez. Service due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mena Hernandez
Represented By: Evan Carroll Bramhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?