United States of America v. 69,940.50 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 69,940.50 in United States Currency
Claimant: Yvonne Silver and Dereck McClellan
Case Number: 6:2019cv01976
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/2/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/16/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/16/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/5/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/6/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/7/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/7/2020, Discovery due by 5/7/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/21/2020, Motions due by 5/21/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/2/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 7/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/4/2020, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/12/19. (sfla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dereck McClellan, Yvonne Silver.(Turner, Adrianne) Modified on 9/12/2019 to change filing date to date that the Answer was received by email - filing user was having technical difficulties. (sfla).
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM asset seizure/forfeiture by Dereck McClellan, Yvonne Silver. (Attachments: #1 Seized Asset Claim by McClellan and Silver)(Turner, Adrianne) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/28/2019 with searchable, signed PDF provided by filing user/attorney) (Attachment 1 replaced and attachment 2 added on 8/28/2019) (sfla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: # 3 Certificate of Service) (sfla, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrianne LaVonne Turner on behalf of Dereck McClellan, Yvonne Silver (Turner, Adrianne)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Sherard, Carrie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $69,490.50 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents fully executed Warrant)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (sfla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (sfla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 69,940.50 in United States Currency filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Verification of Jantzen Blackmon)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 69,940.50 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 69,940.50 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Yvonne Silver
Represented By: Adrianne LaVonne Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dereck McClellan
Represented By: Adrianne LaVonne Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?