McCoy v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Janet A McCoy
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv02016
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Stipulation Deadline 1/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/5/19. (alew, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Quattlebaum, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Quattlebaum, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 9/5/2019. (Quattlebaum, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet A McCoy. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Janet A McCoy.(alew, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8565261.), filed by Janet A McCoy. Service due by 10/17/2019(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet A McCoy
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James Derrick Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?